Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sunset Auto Center, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Centeno, German Vargas, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Brown, Rick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2011 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time27 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
November 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Brown, Rick |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear for Party, Filed | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.