Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Ostler, Skip L, Ostler, Karie A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management132 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2011 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Time To Trial203 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time837 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal, Filed | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.