Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Murphy, Robert L, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mccullough, William F, against Postlewait, Rocky, Valencia, Judy, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Motter, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2013 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed as to Rocky Postlewait only, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Motter, Denise |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Judgment for Plaintiff, Filed; |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report of Settlement Master, Filed MSC not held; no appearance by deft Judy Valencia, Filed; |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial, Filed Filed; |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default, Filed as to Rocky Postlewait, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.