Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
O'Reilly Automotive Stores Inc, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Graham, Bruce N, against Ingram, Joel Ray, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Tort Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate, Filed of Facts RE Unsatisfied Judgment, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Proof of Service
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Court, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; 07/22/2013 Received; |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Court Judgment, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; 07/10/2013 |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration, Filed re Summary of Case, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Reject Letter Returning Case Management Conference. Document is not signed, Filed; BM; |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause, Filed re proof of service, Filed; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.