Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Morrissey, Sean D, against Marquez, Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2013 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; 10/28/2013 ;Granted ; |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration, Filed per CCP 1033(b)(2), Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration, Filed per CCP 585, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Filed; |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complaint Contract, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.