Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hedrick, Stephanie Ray, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Montoya, Socorro, Gallardo, Daniela, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed sent to Montoya returned by post office, Mail Returned Undelivered; |
|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed sent to Gallardo returned by post office, Mail Returned Undelivered; |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed of Dismisssal, Filed; |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Neither party pres. Dismissed without prejudice, Filed; |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Pltf pres, Defts not pres. Cont'd to 7-26-13 to, Filed; attempt service.; |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Non-Service of Plaintiff's Claim as to Socorro Montoya, Filed; |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Non-Service of Plaintiff's Claim as to Daniela Gallardo, Filed; |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed Amended (to clean up claim), Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.