Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Entra Default Solutions, filed a(n) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) (42) case represented by Seigel, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2013 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) (42) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Trust Deposit $32790.92 2014-08-22 Distributed Reference ID: 509675 | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order, Filed to Disburse Surplus Funds, Filed; Filed By Claimant; ;Granted ; |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed to Disburse Surplus Funds, Filed; Filed By Claimant; 06/09/2014 Received; 07/16/2014 Received; |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Hearing:, Filed; Court made order re upon receipt of order, purs CC 2924(k) & 2924(j), SBSC shall release the full amount in deposit with check payable to Bank of America; upon entry of order pet. is discharged; |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing, Filed for Countywide Home Loans Inc, Mail Returned Undelivered; |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing, Filed for Carol Myers, Mail Returned Undelivered; |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing, Filed for Countywide Home Loans Inc, Mail Returned Undelivered; |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed to Disburse Surplus Funds, Returned to Submitting Party; Filed By Claimant; 03/17/2014 Received; |
|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing, Filed of Notice of Hearing, Filed; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.