Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Henry, Richard, against Morales, Jose Andres, represented by Ikola, Robert R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with McGregor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGregor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2012 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2016 | Docket Event | DOJ Request - Initial | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Compliance IID from DMV, Filed | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Modification: New Remand Date
Judge: McGregor, John |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Installment Payment Plan Agreement, Filed | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Right to Trial by Jury Waived | |
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.