Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holden, Stewart M, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Holden, Stewart M, against Seal, Spencer, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHerman, James E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2012 |
Category06-Contract - Breach Cont/Warranty - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions546 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time546 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.