Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kirkpatrick, Mishaela J, against Martinez, Rocky, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
JudgedeBellefeuille, Denise Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2012 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions429 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time429 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Returned | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address, Filed | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Return on Writ of Attachment/Execution, Filed | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney, Filed | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.