Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Seja, Elvira, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Kasreliovich, Slav, against Mccool, Virginia, represented by Borgeson, Jay M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time360 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service, Filed | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement, Filed | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.