Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jordanos Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Daugherty, Jeff, against Vanderwall, Claudella Deon, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2012 |
Category06-Contract - Breach Cont/Warranty - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Disqualification/Challenge, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.