Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pini, Dario L, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Miranda, Johnny, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
JudgedeBellefeuille, Denise Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2012 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions6 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession, Issued | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession, Issued | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Unlawful Detainer CCP1161.2, Filed | |
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.