Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Reese, Harlan M, against Fenstermaker, Jeffery Scott, Quintana, Alexandrea Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Returned | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.