Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robinson-Mcelroy, Sarah A, against Maguellon, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2012 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion: Vacate
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion, Filed | |
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed | |
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation, Filed | |
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.