Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kluball, Kimberly Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Muni Stat Plea | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.