Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Castillo, Anthony Mejia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Farley, Hal P, against Elder, Carnel Luther Lee, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Proof of Service
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
April 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Proof of Service
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
April 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause, Filed | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.