Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Treuer, Derrik M, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Frances, Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Non-Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.