Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E, against Rosas, Federico, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time603 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement, Filed | |
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.