Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Honor, Thomas Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event | For Refunds Due (Overpayments More Than $15) | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Release | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Franchise Tax Board Court Ordered Debt Program | |
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Abstract | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Pay | |
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.