Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Scott, Zachary Dean, Sr, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Release | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Abstract | |
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Pay | |
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.