Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Santa Barbara, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Czuleger, Jerry F, against Santa Barbara Bail Bonds, American Surety Company, represented by Pegg, Brendan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time870 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Receipt, Filed | |
May 07, 2014 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Permanent Stay of Enforcement TENTATIVE RULING: As set forth herein, the motion of defendant American Surety Company for permanent stay of enforcement of the judgment en...
Judge: James Herman |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Reply, Filed | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Opposition, Filed | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.