Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Altmeyer, Jeannine, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Montecito Motors Inc, Taylor, Chester Adam, Taylor, Chester Lee, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time215 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney, Filed | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.