Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Meza, Carmen A, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Se, against Ndex West Llc, Wells Fargo Bank Na, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, represented by Flewelling, Mark T, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions303 days |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time295 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment, Filed | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling, Filed | |
October 18, 2012 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint; Case Management Conference For the reasons stated herein, the demurrers of defendants Wells Fargo and NDeX are sustained to the second amen...
Judge: Denise deBellefeuille |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Demurrer
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.