Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bjorklund, Eric, filed a(n) Civil case against City Of Santa Barbara California, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions80 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time80 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment, Filed | |
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
February 27, 2012 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Writ of Mandate Santa Barbara County Superior Court Department 5 Judge Colleen K. Sterne Tentative Ruling February 27, 2012 Case: Eric Bjorklund v. City of Santa Barbara Case No...
Judge: Colleen Sterne |
|
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Mandate
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Document, Lodged | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Document, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.