Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shipp, Jessica Leigh, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Geoghegan, Terence, against Liu, Hiukei, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions519 days |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time519 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Demand for Trial by Jury, Filed | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint, Filed | |
July 17, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Order Setting Aside Default & Default Judgment Jessica Leigh Shipp v. Hiukei Liu, Case No. 1383232 (Judge Herman) Hearing Date: July 17, 2013 Motion: Motion of Defendant...
Judge: James Herman |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion: Order
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Brief, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.