Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, A New York Partnership, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Miele, Kenneth J, against Boynton, Gary, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2011 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Bankruptcy Stay | |
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.