Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butte County Credit Bureau, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case represented by Selby, Joseph L, against Mortensen, Steve, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2006 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2448 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTY FOR [P]; OLD ATTY: DRISCOL NEW ATTY: SELBY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,458.54 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: NTC OF RESCHEDULING Desc2: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc3: 01/08/07 @ 10:30 AM Notice Date: 2006-09-06 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 996 - NOTICE SENT Disp Clerk: VLA Filing Clerk: VLA Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR-DEFAULT JMT BY CLERK Disp Clerk: CLL Filing Clerk: VLA Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED - YOLO CK# 33164 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 372616 Fee Amount: 15.00 Entry Clerk: CLL 456 - $15.00 | |
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Clerk DEFAULT JMT BY CLERK FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF M ANDERSON RE INTEREST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO STEVE MORTENSEN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL | |
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO STEVE MORTESEN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.