Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Price, Eulanda, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
February 16, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
November 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.