Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Castaneda, Felipe, Stardancer Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Se, against Castaneda, Felipe, represented by Tetalman, Garry M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time234 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement, Filed | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.