Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gilner, Barbara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Prentice, Chad M, against Turner, Richard Michael, represented by Wessler, Charles P, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2011 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time310 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement, Received | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement, Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.