Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ros, Sarath, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
October 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.