Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2007 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2021 |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Bail Forfeiture | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.