Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ruiz, Robert Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Muni Stat Plea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.