Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Johnson, Stephen Charles, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2007 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Bail Forfeiture | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
November 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
November 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.