Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wooder Llc, Becca Ii Property Llc, Hi Desert Mobile Home Park Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Bartlett, Terry A, against Gutierrez, Leopoldo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management399 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2010 |
CategoryLimited Residential Unlawful Detainer (32) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.