Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Roberts, Rudy Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2007 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Bail Forfeiture | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
November 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.