Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Tinoco, Julio Vega, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2007 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedJune 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
September 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
August 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.