Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Camilo, Gerardo Paulino, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2007 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Franchise Tax Board Court Ordered Debt Program | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Abstract | |
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Pay | |
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Muni Stat Plea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.