Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal National Mortgage Associati N, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Gonzales, Michael, against Morales, Carmen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Motter, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 30, 2010 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions24 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time24 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession, Issued | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Prejudgment Claim, Filed | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Unlawful Detainer CCP1161.2, Filed | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Unlawful Detainer CCP1161.2, Filed | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.