Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collar, Russel, Decker, Myles, Rykaart, Ferdinandus, Flint, Gary M, Reiner, Russell, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited case represented by Shepherd, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Steven J. Howell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven J. Howell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management93 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2004 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions194 days |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time2108 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR DISMISSAL ENTERED Disp Clerk: SLG Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal NTC OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT FROM 05/26/06 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: CLL Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Demurrer / Motion to Strike Desc: [D- FUTURA THERMAL, FLINT, REINER Desc2: DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: SLG Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING MINUTE ORDER 6/14/06 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING COURT MINUTE ORDER FOR 05/26/06 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT'D FROM 4/21/06 Desc3: THIS IS TO TRAIL THE DEMURRER Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 06/16/06 Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: SLG Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Demurrer / Motion to Strike Desc: [D-FUTURA THERMAL, FLINT, REINER] Desc2: DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 0/16/06) Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: SLG Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.