Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Booska, Steven A, against Trabucco, Anita L, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management215 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2004 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions155 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: September 14, 2011Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: March 26, 2015Notice
Date: May 11, 2015Declaration
Date: August 29, 2012Declaration
Date: December 18, 2015Declaration
Date: March 26, 2015Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: September 09, 2015Notice of Renewal
Date: March 26, 2015Application For And Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190)
Date: March 26, 2015Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: September 26, 2016Minute Order
Date: September 09, 2011Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: August 29, 2012Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: December 18, 2015Application and Order for Exam-Judgment Debtor
Date: June 20, 2011Complaint Filed - 30 Day Summons Issued - Under 10K
Date: December 29, 2004Request
Date: June 02, 2005Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: June 11, 2007Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: March 14, 2011Order
Date: June 03, 2005Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: September 04, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued Tehama County |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to Los Angeles County |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: post judgment accrued interest |
|
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied Sacramento |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Steven A Booska Re Post Judgment Accrued Interest Declaration DECL OF S BOOSKA RE POST JMT ACCRUED INTEREST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT FILED COSTS $216.00 INTEREST $657.67 CREDIT $0 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.