Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcy, Thomas M, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Oxton, Charles M, against Harris, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 21, 2009 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions29 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time29 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address, Filed | |
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court, Filed | |
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.