Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Monarch Country Mobilehome Owners Association, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Ballantine, James P, against City Council For The City Of Goleta, City Of Goleta, represented by Giles, Tim W, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management164 days |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial452 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions697 days |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1753 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment, Filed | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
February 05, 2014 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Entry of Judgment Tentative Ruling: The court enters judgment pursuant to the court of appeal’s order of remand, denies petitioner and plaintiff Monarch Country Mobileho...
Judge: James Herman |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion: Entry of Judgment
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.