Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Hummer, Christopher Michael, represented by Archer, Jennifer A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Dandona, Jean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections: Updated Information | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: Dandona, Jean |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Probation Declaration, Order, & Notice, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.