Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Crook, Cynthia Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2007 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2007 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
August 24, 2007 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
August 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
July 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Traffic School Certificate Filed | |
May 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral | |
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.