Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Chapman-Shobe, Portrice, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Melville, Rodney S presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 27, 2008 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions131 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time131 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
October 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Non-Service, Filed | |
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.