Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ge Money Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stebbins, Donald R, against Killian, Diane, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Melville, Rodney S presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management84 days |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Time To Trial189 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time121 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Melville, Rodney S |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Removed from Court's Control | |
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Melville, Rodney S |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.