Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Nicholas, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hall, James Michael, against Ortega, Isidra, Guerrero, Baltazar, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Motter, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause, Filed | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Unlawful Detainer CCP1161.2, Filed | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint Unlawful Detainer, Filed | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.