Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Wallace, Earl R, against Salazar, Miguel, Salazar, Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Motter, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Time To Trial46 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions46 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment, Filed | |
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default, Filed | |
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Request to Set Case for Trial, Filed | |
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Answer, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.